Stephanie Jean Mann
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00175 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
35
07/19/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
36
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
37
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
10/18/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
39
10/18/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
40
11/14/2018
Certificate of No Objection
11/15/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/15/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
42
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
12/06/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
44
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.