Stephanie Nell Barnes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01664 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 186 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/17/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Stephanie Nell Barnes (Shinn, J.)
3
04/17/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Stephanie Nell Barnes. (Shinn, J.)
4
04/17/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Stephanie Nell Barnes. (Shinn, J.)
04/17/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-01664-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21969106. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/17/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/14/2018 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 07/13/2018.
6
04/18/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
04/18/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 4/18/2018.
8
04/18/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
9
04/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 04/19/2018.
10
04/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/20/2018.
11
05/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, James G Henderson, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0.00, Assets Exempt: $ 949.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 38754.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 38754.00.
12
07/15/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
15
08/02/2018
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed; the Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled; and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is closed. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.