Stephen Russell Boyle and Kathleen Anne Boyle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00076 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/12/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Stephen Russell Boyle and Kathleen Anne Boyle
17
06/18/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
06/18/2018
Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/19/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
06/20/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
06/20/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
20
06/20/2018
Employ (CM41)
21
06/20/2018
Declaration
22
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
24
06/22/2018
Employ
25
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
26
02/14/2019
Compensation / Professional Fees
27
03/06/2019
Entry of Appearance
28
03/27/2019
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
29
04/10/2019
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
30
04/10/2019
Certificate of Service
05/02/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
05/03/2019
Certificate of No Objection
32
05/15/2019
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.