Stephen T. Howes and Kathleen Polley Howes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00292 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
48
09/10/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
09/10/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
09/13/2018
Request for Special Notice
09/14/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
09/20/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
51
09/25/2018
Non-Opposition
52
09/30/2018
Certificate of Service
10/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
10/04/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
10/10/2018
Sell Free and Clear of Liens
55
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/14/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.