Steve Dwayne Reynolds
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04193 (alnb)

Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, cs)

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: CASE NO: 17-04193-TOM13 STEVE DWAYNE REYNOLDS Debtor. TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMES NOW Bradford W. Caraway, Chapter 13 Standing Trustee, and moves this Honorable Court to dismiss the Debtor's case. As grounds therefore, the Trustee shows the following: 1. The Trustee files this motion pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1307(c). 2. There has been a material default by the Debtor with respect to a term of the confirmed plan. 3. The Debtor is not making plan payments as required by the Confirmation Order. WHEREFORE, the Trustee moves this Honorable Court to dismiss this case. The Trustee requests such other relief as the Court deems appropriate. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 (205) 323-4631 Certificate of Service I hereby certify that a correct copy of the foregoing motion has been forwarded by email or U.S. mail, to the following on this the 27th day of July, 2018: STEVE DWAYNE REYNOLDS BOND, BOTES, REESE & SHINN, P.C. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway TRUSTEE STEVE DWAYNE REYNOLDS 2640 MUD CREEK ROAD ADGER, AL 35006 Case 17-04193-TOM13 Doc 22 Filed 07/27/18 Entered 07/27/18 12:22:17 Desc Page 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s)[22] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 8/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.

Van−022 [Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss] (Rev. 09/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04193−TOM13 Steve Dwayne Reynolds Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−4867 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Notice is hereby given that a Trustee's Motion to Dismiss has been filed in this case. An evidentiary hearing will be held on 8/27/18 at 10:00 AM in Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 3, Birmingham, AL 35203 to consider and act upon the motion and any response. Notice is further given that if the Debtor or the Debtor's attorney fails to appear at this hearing, the trustee's motion may be granted without further notice. If the attorney for the Debtor fails to appear at this hearing, the Court may impose monetary sanctions or other appropriate sanctions; reduce the award of attorney's fees in the case; and/or require the attorney to disgorge a portion of the fees awarded and paid in the case. If the motion is not granted, the Court may order that: A. (1) if a deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 60 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice; or B. (1) if no deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 30 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice. Consent forms must be filed no later than 10:00 p.m. on the day preceeding the scheduled hearing day. If a consent form is not fully completed or is not timely filed, it will not be considered and attendance is required by the Debtor, the Debtor's Attorney and the Chapter 13 Trustee. DEBTORS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS SHOULD DRESS APPROPRIATELY TO APPEAR IN THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY COURT. Dated: July 27, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court mwb Case 17-04193-TOM13 Doc 23 Filed 07/27/18 Entered 07/27/18 15:06:37 Desc Ntc of Hrg on Trt Motion to Di Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[23] Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 07/29/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04193-TOM Steve Dwayne Reynolds Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: mbrown Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jul 27, 2018 Form ID: van022 Total Noticed: 25 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 29, 2018. db +Steve Dwayne Reynolds, 2640 Mud Creek Road, Adger, AL 35006-1108 9509281 +BARCLAY MASTERCARD, PO BOX 60517, CITY OF INDUSTRY CA 91716-0517 9509282 +BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, 100 S WEST ST, WILMINGTON DE 19801-5015 9509288 +MOBILOANS LLC, 151 MELACON ROAD, MARKSVILLE LA 71351-3065 9509290 PAYPAL/COMENITY, PO BOX 105658, ATLANTA GA 30348-5658 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9509278 +E-mail/Text: ally@ebn.phinsolutions.com Jul 28 2018 03:18:56 ALLY FINANCIAL, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 380901, BLOOMINGTON MN 55438-0901 9509279 +E-mail/Text: bk@avant.com Jul 28 2018 03:24:39 AVANT CREDIT, INC, ATTENTION BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 9183380, CHICAGO IL 60691-3380 9528066 E-mail/Text: ally@ebn.phinsolutions.com Jul 28 2018 03:18:56 Ally Financial, PO Box 130424, Roseville, MN 55113-0004 9509283 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.cocard.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 28 2018 03:29:09 CAPITAL ONE, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 30253, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0253 9509284 +E-mail/Text: bkr@cardworks.com Jul 28 2018 03:18:38 CARDWORKS/CW NEXUS, MERRICK BANK, PO BOX 9201, OLD BETHPAGE NY 11804-9001 9509285 +E-mail/Text: BNC-ALLIANCE@QUANTUM3GROUP.COM Jul 28 2018 03:21:06 COMENITY/OVERSTOCK, PO BOX 182125, COLUMBUS OH 43218-2125 9509286 +E-mail/Text: bk@lendingclub.com Jul 28 2018 03:24:09 LENDING CLUB CORP, 71 STEVENSON STREET, SUITE 300, SAN FRANCISCO CA 94105-2985 9627710 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 28 2018 03:27:05 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of Golden Caps Trust, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9622425 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 28 2018 03:28:59 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of LendingClub Corporation &, LC Trust I, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9615039 E-mail/Text: bkr@cardworks.com Jul 28 2018 03:18:38 MERRICK BANK, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10368, Greenville, SC 29603-0368 9509289 +E-mail/PDF: cbp@onemainfinancial.com Jul 28 2018 03:27:23 ONE MAIN, PO BOX 1010, EVANSVILLE IN 47706-1010 9540149 +E-mail/PDF: cbp@onemainfinancial.com Jul 28 2018 03:27:23 OneMain, PO Box 3251, Evansville, IN 47731-3251 9614835 E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 28 2018 03:39:30 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, POB 41067, Norfolk VA 23541 9620994 E-mail/Text: bnc-quantum@quantum3group.com Jul 28 2018 03:21:25 Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, MOMA Funding LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 9509291 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@speedyinc.com Jul 28 2018 03:20:04 SPEEDY CASH, 3527 NORTH RIDGE ROAD, WICHITA KS 67205-1212 9509292 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@swmc.com Jul 28 2018 03:22:55 SUN WEST MORTGAGE CO, 18303 GRIDLEY RD, CERRITOS CA 90703-5400 9509293 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 28 2018 03:28:26 SYNCHRONY BANK/CHEVRON, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 965060, ORLANDO FL 32896-5060 9509294 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 28 2018 03:26:36 SYNCHRONY BANK/LOWES, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 965060, ORLANDO FL 32896-5060 9509295 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 28 2018 03:26:36 SYNCHRONY BANK/WALMART, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 965060, ORLANDO FL 32896-5060 9617689 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@speedyinc.com Jul 28 2018 03:20:04 Speedy/Rapid Cash, P.O. Box 780408, Wichita, KS 67278-0408 TOTAL: 20 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9509287* +LENDING CLUB CORP, 71 STEVENSON ST, SUITE 300, SAN FRANCISCO CA 94105-2985 9509280 ##+BANK OF AMERICA, NC4-105-03-14, PO BOX 26012, GREENSBORO NC 27420-6012 TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 1 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '##' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as undeliverable. Notices will no longer be delivered by the USPS to these addresses; therefore, they have been bypassed. The debtor's attorney or pro se debtor was advised that the specified notice was undeliverable. Case 17-04193-TOM13 Doc 24 Filed 07/29/18 Entered 07/30/18 00:08:13 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: mbrown Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jul 27, 2018 Form ID: van022 Total Noticed: 25 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (continued) ***** I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 29, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 27, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com TOTAL: 2 Case 17-04193-TOM13 Doc 24 Filed 07/29/18 Entered 07/30/18 00:08:13 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−022 [Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss] (Rev. 09/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04193−TOM13 Steve Dwayne Reynolds Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−4867 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Notice is hereby given that a Trustee's Motion to Dismiss has been filed in this case. An evidentiary hearing will be held on 8/27/18 at 10:00 AM in Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 3, Birmingham, AL 35203 to consider and act upon the motion and any response. Notice is further given that if the Debtor or the Debtor's attorney fails to appear at this hearing, the trustee's motion may be granted without further notice. If the attorney for the Debtor fails to appear at this hearing, the Court may impose monetary sanctions or other appropriate sanctions; reduce the award of attorney's fees in the case; and/or require the attorney to disgorge a portion of the fees awarded and paid in the case. If the motion is not granted, the Court may order that: A. (1) if a deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 60 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice; or B. (1) if no deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 30 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice. Consent forms must be filed no later than 10:00 p.m. on the day preceeding the scheduled hearing day. If a consent form is not fully completed or is not timely filed, it will not be considered and attendance is required by the Debtor, the Debtor's Attorney and the Chapter 13 Trustee. DEBTORS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS SHOULD DRESS APPROPRIATELY TO APPEAR IN THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY COURT. Dated: July 27, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court mwb Case 17-04193-TOM13 Doc 24 Filed 07/29/18 Entered 07/30/18 00:08:13 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds (RE: related document(s)[22] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: SteveDwayneReynolds Case Number: 17-04193-TOM Debtor. CONSENT TO ACTION AT HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comes now the Debtor and hereby consents to the following action being taken in the hearing on the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss: O The case may bedismissed. • The case shall be converted to one under chapter 7atthe Debtor's request. [£r The Debtor shall resume his/her regular payments tothe Trustee. The Debtor consents that the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss will be conditionally DENIED pending comphance by the Debtor with these conditions: (1) the Debtor shall cause a full plan paymentto be received in the Trustee's officebefore4:00 p.m., 30 days from the date of the hearing on the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss: and, (2) the Debtor shallcauseall plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on the dates due. The Debtor further consents that if he/she fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the Debtor and Debtor'sattorney, after which the Court may grant the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may dismiss this case without further notice or hearing. • The Trustee shall issue a payroll deduction order to the employer of theDebtor, (name of Debtor) at: (employer's name) (employer's address) (employer's telephone number) The Debtor understands that he/she shall make direct payments to the Trustee until the employer begins the deductions. • TheDebtor consents toincrease Chapter 13plan payments to. -<Rf CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR(S) *This form must be signed by the Debtor. Case 17-04193-TOM13 Doc 25 Filed 08/08/18 Entered 08/08/18 12:23:18 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/29/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Steve Dwayne Reynolds
2
09/29/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds.
4
09/29/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds.
5
09/29/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds.
09/29/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04193-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21221590. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/29/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds.
7
09/29/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds.
8
09/29/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/08/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/30/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/06/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/28/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/08/2018.
9
09/30/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
10/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/01/2017.
10/02/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds Case Number 87-03814, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/28/1987, Standard Discharge on 07/28/1987; Case Number 12-00110, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/09/2012, Standard Discharge on 04/09/2012.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
10/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds). Notice Date 10/04/2017.
12
10/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/04/2017.
13
11/09/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/08/2017. (Ch13troffice, sc)
14
11/09/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
15
11/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/30/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
16
11/13/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds.
17
11/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/15/2017.
18
11/29/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 11/30/2017 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
12/01/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
20
01/03/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn. Signed on 1/3/2018 (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 16 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds).
21
01/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/05/2018.
22
07/27/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, cs)
23
07/27/2018
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s)[22] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 8/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
07/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[23] Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 07/29/2018.
25
08/08/2018
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds (RE: related document(s)[22] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
26
08/08/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s)[25] Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debtor Steve Dwayne Reynolds). Hearing scheduled 8/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.