Steve L. Gros and Connie Clement Gros
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01847 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 232 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/01/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Steve L. Gros, Connie Clement Gros
2
05/01/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros.
4
05/01/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros.
5
05/01/2018
*ENTERED IN ERROR - Does not include all documents* Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros. Modified on 5/1/2018
05/01/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01847-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22019712. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/01/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros.
7
05/01/2018
Appraisal Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros.
8
05/01/2018
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros
9
05/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/06/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/10/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/29/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 08/06/2018.
10
05/01/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros (RE: related document(s) 5 Employee Income Records).
11
05/01/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Steve L. Gros, Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros). Hearing scheduled 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
12
05/02/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
05/02/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Steve L. Gros and Connie Clement Gros Case Number 93-50792, Chapter 7 filed in Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court on 08/25/1993, Standard Discharge on 12/14/1993; Case Number 02-10229, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Southern Bankruptcy Court on 01/15/2002, Standard Discharge on 05/01/2002; Case Number 05-10419, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Southern Bankruptcy Court on 01/26/2005, Standard Discharge on 08/17/2010; Case Number 18-00069, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/08/2018, Dismissed for Other Reason on 02/12/2018; Case Number 86-14102, Chapter 7 filed in Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court on 10/16/1986; Case Number 03-12514, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Southern Bankruptcy Court on 04/30/2003.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
05/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 05/03/2018.
14
05/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Steve L. Gros, Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros). Notice Date 05/03/2018.
15
05/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/03/2018.
16
05/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/04/2018.
17
05/22/2018
ORDER Granting Signed on 05/22/2018 RE: Doc #8; Debtors' Motion to Extend Automatic Stay.
18
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Order Granting). Notice Date 05/24/2018.
19
06/06/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
20
06/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 6/6/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
21
06/07/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
22
06/07/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor World Omni Financial Corp. Its Successors and Assigns (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros.).
23
06/08/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
06/08/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 22 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor World Omni Financial Corp. Its Successors and Assigns). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
25
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/10/2018.
26
07/09/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros.). (Shinn, J.)
27
07/09/2018
Supplemental Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 3015-1(c) Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros (RE: related document(s) 26 Amended Chapter 13 Plan). (Shinn, J.)
28
07/11/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Clement Gros, Debtor Steve L. Gros. (Shinn, J.)
29
07/12/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/12/2018 (RE: related document(s) 9 Confirmation Hearing), 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case, 22 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor World Omni Financial Corp. Its Successors and Assigns). Hearing scheduled 8/7/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/14/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.