Steven Christian Giesler and Kristen Leigh Coletti-Giesler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00167 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
05/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
doc
05/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
05/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
doc
06/01/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
06/05/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
16
06/06/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
17
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
18
06/14/2018
Extend Time
19
06/15/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
20
06/15/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
21
06/15/2018
Extend Time
06/15/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/12/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
23
07/17/2018
Entry of Appearance
24
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
25
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
26
07/20/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
27
07/20/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
28
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/02/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
31
08/02/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
32
12/05/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.