Steven Donald Cockrell and Karla Hope Cockrell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05211 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 142 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/11/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Steven Donald Cockrell, Karla Hope Cockrell
2
12/11/2017
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.
4
12/11/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.
5
12/11/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.
12/11/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-05211-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21496547. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/11/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.
7
12/11/2017
Appraisal Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.
12/12/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Steven Donald Cockrell and Karla Hope Cockrell Case Number 10-01569, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/10/2010, Standard Discharge on 04/09/2015.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/12/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/11/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
9
12/12/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
12/12/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
11
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
12
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell, Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
13
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
14
01/02/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
01/09/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
16
01/11/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.).
17
01/12/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, sc)
18
01/12/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 16 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
01/12/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
20
01/12/2018
Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions. (Ch13troffice, ul)
21
01/16/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 20 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
22
01/17/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/24/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, sc)
23
01/17/2018
Debtor's Objection to Duplicate Claim # 12 of OneMain Financial of Alabama, Inc. in the amount of $2,345.65 Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.
24
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
25
01/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 01/24/2018. (Ch13troffice, sc)
26
02/05/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
27
02/05/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
28
02/07/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc dba GM Financial.
29
02/09/2018
Withdrawal of Claims: 12 Filed by Creditor OneMain.
30
02/23/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
31
02/23/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/22/2018 11:30:39 AM ]. File Size [ 853 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:22 ]. (RE: Doc #16; Objection to Confirmation Filed by Thomas Tutten, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank NA). (adiuser).
32
02/28/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Robert Reese, Attorney for Debtors', has not emailed the order on Debtor's Objection to Duplicate Claim to Judge Mitchell's eorders box. SOLUTION: please email the order on Debtors' Objection to Duplicate Claim to Judge Mitchell's eorders box (ordersTOM@alnb.uscourts.gov) If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 23 Debtor's Objection to Duplicate Claim filed by Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell, Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell).
33
02/28/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 23 Debtor's Objection to Duplicate Claim # 12 of OneMain Financial of Alabama, Inc. in the amount of $2,345.65 Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.).
34
02/28/2018
Withdrawal of Debtors' Objection to Duplicate Claim #12 Filed by Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell, Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell.
35
03/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Withdrawal of Claim filed by Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell, Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell). Notice Date 03/02/2018.
36
03/19/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. The Trustee's objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. The Trustee's objection to debtor(s)' claim of exemptions is overruled. The objection to Confirmation filed by Wells Fargo is overruled. Signed on 3/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 2, 16, 17 19).
37
03/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 03/21/2018.
40
07/26/2018
Order Imposing Deadline - Debtors have filed a motion seeking to purchase an automobile and finance it and the motion will be set for a hearing on 8/23/2018. If Debtors or their counsel deem it appropriate to file amended schedules I and J, the schedules shall be filed and served on or before noon on 8/15/2018. /s/ TAMARA O. MITCHELL (RE:38 Motion to Incur Debt)
41
07/26/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s)[38] Motion to Incur Debt filed by Debtor Steven Donald Cockrell, Joint Debtor Karla Hope Cockrell). Hearing scheduled 8/23/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
08/08/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Changes of Claim No. 15 filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. as Servicer (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.