Steven Lewis Buhler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00089 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
doc
05/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
doc
05/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
doc
05/23/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
05/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
39
06/05/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
40
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
41
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
42
07/06/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
43
07/06/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
44
07/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
45
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
46
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
47
07/20/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
48
07/23/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
07/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
08/07/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
08/07/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
08/07/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
53
08/07/2018
Certificate of Service
54
08/13/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.