Stovall v. AES Houston Contracting Company, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00259 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/30/2018
Complaint
2
10/30/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/30/2018
Unissued Summons
10/30/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/19/2018
Order
5
02/12/2019
Corporate Disclosure Statement
6
02/12/2019
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
7
02/22/2019
Order
8
03/15/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
9
03/15/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
10
03/29/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
03/29/2019
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
04/11/2019
Amend/Correct
12
04/11/2019
Memorandum
13
04/25/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
14
04/26/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
15
04/29/2019
Additional Related Document
16
04/30/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
04/30/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
05/07/2019
Amended Complaint

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.