Strane, et al v. Monaco Coach Corp., et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:1998-cv-00030 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/14/1998
DEMAND for jury trial by Wes Strane & Janice Strane (dkt clerk)
2
01/14/1998
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Monaco Coach Corp. and Hehr International (dkt clerk)
3
01/16/1998
ANSWER to Complaint by Monaco Coach Corp.; (Attorney Keith J. Pflaum). Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
4
01/16/1998
ANSWER to Complaint by Hehr International; (Attorney Chadwick F. Morriss). (dkt clerk)
01/23/1998
NOTICE of Assigment to U. S. Magistate Judge mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/1998
File referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
02/18/1998
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 3:30 PM on 3/13/98 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody by telephone conference call ; directing plaintiff to set up conference call; Ordered that on or before 3/11/98, each party shall complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the attached consent form; if the forms are not received by this date, the court will assume that the parties do not consent and will cancel the scheduling conference; (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies mailed to counsel; Furnished: Marie & Ace. (dkt clerk) Modified on 02/18/1998
6
02/20/1998
ACCEPTANCE and WAIVER by Bill Pryor, Attorney General of the State of Alabama; (Attachment). Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
7
03/23/1998
MOTION by Monaco Coach Corp. to Compel. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
8
03/24/1998
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Keith J. Pflaum, counsel for Monaco Coach Corporation. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
9
03/24/1998
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge by counsel for defendant HEHR International. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
10
03/24/1998
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge by counsel for plaintiffs. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
11
04/08/1998
ORDER denying [7-1] motion to Compel as further set out in order; directing Counsel for the parties to hold not later than 20 days from the date of this order, the required good faith conference (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
12
04/08/1998
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 9:00 12/3/98 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody Motion Filing deadline on 9/3/98 ; Discovery cutoff 11/19/98 ; jury trial set for 10:00 1/4/99 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ; set amended pleading deadline for 6/22/98 Jury selection set for 10:00 1/4/99 before Honorable John L. Carroll Mediation Notice deadline on 7/18/98 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, CAC, SL, and CA.
13
11/18/1998
ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/98, at 9:00 AM; all motions which have not been submitted or ruled on will be heard at this time; directing parties to jointly prepare a proposed pretrial order consistent with the outline attached to this order; directing plaintiff to insure that the original of proposed pretrial order is received by Court; setting Proposed Pretrial Order Deadline to 11/30/98 ; (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk)
14
11/30/1998
ORDER directing parties to file a joint stipulation for dismissal; setting Stipulation for Dismissall deadline to 12/10/98 ; (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk)
15
12/02/1998
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wes Strane and Janice Strane. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/07/1998
16
12/04/1998
ORDER that upon consideration of [15-1] Stipulation of Dismissal, 12/2/98, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED dismissing this case with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs; (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies mailed to counsel; Furnished: Ace & Curtis. (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/04/1998
12/04/1998
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
12/04/1998
STIPULATION of Dismissal by all parties. (dkt clerk)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.