Strong v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cv-00165 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
131
06/01/2018
In Limine
132
06/01/2018
Proposed Findings of Fact
133
06/01/2018
Trial Brief
134
06/01/2018
Proposed Findings of Fact
135
06/12/2018
Proposed Findings of Fact
136
06/12/2018
Notice (Other)
137
06/19/2018
Bench Trial - Completed
138
07/10/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
139
07/30/2018
Transcript
140
09/17/2018
Notice of Settlement
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
142
10/05/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
143
10/08/2018
Notice (Other)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.