Susan Lauderdale
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02034 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
07/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
39
08/27/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
46
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
47
02/08/2019
Transfer of Claim
48
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.