Susan Perez Sagun
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00133 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
06/18/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
13
07/31/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
14
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
08/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
16
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/24/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.