Susie Mae Holmes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00210 (alnb)

Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE:) CASE NO.: 18-00210-TOM13 SUSIE MAE HOLMES) SS#: ###-##-3756))) DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION TO: BHAM BOARD OF EDUCATION This Direction replaces any Direction you ATTN: PAYROLL DEPT. have previously received from the Trustee ATTN: VALARIE BISHOP regarding this Debtor. P.O. BOX 10007 BIRMINGHAM, AL 35202- the employer of the above-named Debtor. The Debtor named herein has filed a petition under Chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code, thereby subjecting his or her future earnings to the jurisdiction of the United States Bankruptcy Court until further notice. The Debtor has filed a written plan and the Bankruptcy Court has assumed jurisdiction over the Debtor's future earnings, which are no longer subject to levy or garnishment except continuing wage- withholding orders for current child support. The Debtor has requested or agreed to the issuance of this Direction to implement the proposed plan in this case, or the plan has been confirmed as provided by law. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1325(c), "After confirmation of a plan, the court may order any entity from whom the debtor receives income to pay all or any part of such income to the trustee." IT IS DIRECTED that, beginning immediately, the above-named Employer is directed to deduct from the Debtor's earnings, vacation pay, and bonuses, the sum of $390.00 MONTHLY and forward said deductions at least once each month to the Chapter 13 Trustee for this Court at: Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee Department SF 3 P.O. Box 830525 Birmingham, AL 35283-0525 The above named employer is hereby enjoined from imposing any type of penalty or taking any type of disciplinary action against the Employee-Debtor based on the issuance or effect of this Direction. It has been issued to implement the Debtor's voluntary Chapter 13 plan as authorized by the U.S. Bankruptcy Code. Any such discriminatory action is prohibited by 11 U.S.C. § 525. DATE: January 23, 2018 /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202-0848 Please include the Debtor's bankruptcy case number with any payment remitted to the Trustee's office. For information regarding this Direction for Deduction, please contact the Trustee's office via telephone (205) 323-4631, via fax (205) 252-0239, or via email info@ch13bham.com. PLEASE NOTIFY THE TRUSTEE'S OFFICE IF THIS DEBTOR LEAVES YOUR EMPLOYMENT SF Case 18-00210-TOM13 Doc 13 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:54:22 Desc Page 1 of 2 «user_initials» Case 18-00210-TOM13 Doc 13 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:54:22 Desc Page 2 of 2

Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA In RE: SUSIE MAE HOLMES § Case Number: 18-00210-TOM-13 § Debtor(s) § Chapter: 13 REQUEST FOR NOTICE UNDER BANKRUPTCY RULE 2002 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A. hereby gives notice as follows: Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §342(f)(1), AIS Portfolio Services, LP hereby requests that: (i) all notices given or required to be given in the case; and (ii) all pleadings and correspondence served or required to be served in this case, regarding Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A. should be directed to AIS Portfolio Services, LP at the following mailing address effective immediately: Attn: Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A. Department AIS Portfolio Services, LP Account: XXXXXXXXX1005 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS Oklahoma City, OK 73118 This request encompasses all notices, copies and pleadings referred to in Rules 2002, 9007 or 9008 of the Bankruptcy Rules, including, without limitation, notices of any Orders, Motions, Demands, Complaints, Petitions, Pleadings, Requests, Applications, Schedules, Statements, Plans, and any other documents brought before this court in this case, whether formal or informal, written or oral, or transmitted or conveyed by mail, delivery, telephone, telecopier, telex, or otherwise which affects or seeks to affect the above case. Respectfully submitted, /s/ Sejal Parmar Sejal Parmar Claims Processor Bankruptcy Servicer for Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A. AIS Portfolio Services, LP 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS Oklahoma City, OK 73118 (817)277-2011, Fax (817) 461-8070 ecfnotices@ascensioncapitalgroup.com File # 1183426 Case 18-00210-TOM13 Doc 14 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 04:33:01 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/18/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Susie Mae Holmes
2
01/18/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request to Surrender Collateral, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Susie Mae Holmes.
4
01/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Susie Mae Holmes.
5
01/18/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Susie Mae Holmes.
01/18/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-00210-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21619245. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/18/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Susie Mae Holmes (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan).
7
01/18/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Susie Mae Holmes.
8
01/18/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/14/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/29/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/17/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/16/2018.
01/19/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Susie Mae Holmes Case Number 94-01147, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/25/1994, Dismissed for Other Reason on 10/17/1994; Case Number 85-03673, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/17/1985; Case Number 92-06803, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/14/1992, Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/12/1993; Case Number 94-07236, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/05/1994, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/02/1997; Case Number 06-02380, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/10/2006, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/05/2010; Case Number 97-03830, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/23/1997, Standard Discharge on 06/08/1998; Case Number 10-06111, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/13/2010, Standard Discharge on 01/21/2011.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/19/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
01/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/20/2018.
11
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Susie Mae Holmes). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
12
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
13
01/23/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
14
01/24/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.