T & H Services, LLC v. Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00296 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/17/2018
Complaint
2
12/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/17/2018
Unissued Summons
12/17/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/31/2018
Order
5
01/17/2019
Notice of Appearance
6
01/17/2019
Corporate Disclosure Statement
7
01/17/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
8
01/18/2019
Certificate of Service
9
01/18/2019
Corporate Disclosure Statement
01/20/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
02/01/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
12
02/07/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
02/11/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
02/19/2019
Seal
15
02/19/2019
Document - Sealed pdf
16
02/19/2019
Certificate of Counsel
02/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Order on Motion to Seal (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
02/19/2019
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
20
03/06/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
21
03/08/2019
Document - Sealed pdf
22
03/10/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
23
03/29/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
24
03/31/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
25
04/05/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
26
04/19/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.