TD Ameritrade v. Matthews
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00136 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
97
07/16/2018
ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS: Motion to Dismiss at Docket 80 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Motion to File Surreply at Docket 88 is GRANTED. Motion for Reconsideration at Docket 90 is DENIED. Mr. Matthews may file a Third Amended Answer and Counterclaim(s) by 07/30/2018. (See order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 07/16/2018.
98
07/30/2018
Counterclaim
99
08/13/2018
Notice of Appearance
100
08/13/2018
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
101
08/29/2018
Stipulation
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
09/10/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
104
09/18/2018
Errata
105
09/18/2018
Declaration
106
09/24/2018
Response in Support of Motion
09/28/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
12/20/2018
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: IT IS ORDERED that TD Ameritrades Motion to Dismiss at Docket 100 is DENIED. TD Ameritrade shall file an answer responsive to the remaining claims within 14 days of the date of this order. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/20/2018.
109
12/27/2018
Stipulation
12/31/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
111
01/17/2019
Answer to Counterclaim
112
01/18/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
113
02/08/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
114
02/15/2019
Scheduling Order
115
04/03/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
116
04/22/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
04/22/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.