TKL Associates, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00253 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
116
07/05/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
117
07/05/2018
Entry of Final Decree
118
07/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
119
07/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
120
07/05/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
121
07/24/2018
Objection to Compensation / Professional Fees (CM47-COAwith)
122
07/25/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
123
07/31/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
124
07/31/2018
Certificate of No Objection
125
07/31/2018
Certificate of No Objection
08/01/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Unterminate Motion / Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
126
08/15/2018
Compensation
127
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
128
08/31/2018
Entry of Final Decree
129
08/31/2018
Compensation
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.