TRIUMVIRATE, LLC v. ZINKE et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00091 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
47
05/18/2018
Response to Order
48
05/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
49
05/24/2018
Order
50
05/30/2018
Response in Support of Motion
51
06/08/2018
ORDER granting 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be filed by 6/15/2018. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/8/18.
52
06/11/2018
Amended Complaint
53
06/12/2018
Amended Complaint
54
06/29/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
55
08/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
56
08/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
57
08/20/2018
Notice (Other)
08/22/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
09/19/2018
Summary Judgment
59
09/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/20/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
10/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
62
10/10/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
63
10/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
64
10/15/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
65
11/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
66
11/16/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
67
11/27/2018
Status Report
68
11/27/2018
Strike
69
11/30/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
70
12/07/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
71
12/10/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
72
12/11/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
73
01/14/2019
Order
74
01/28/2019
Notice (Other)
75
01/29/2019
Order
76
01/30/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
77
02/13/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
02/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
02/19/2019
ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 59 and 76 Motions for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/19/19.
80
02/26/2019
Judgment
81
04/29/2019
Notice of Appeal
82
05/03/2019
USCA Case Number
83
05/03/2019
USCA Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.