Taelorrae T. Wilson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00152 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/08/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
05/08/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
05/08/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
05/08/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
05/08/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/08/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
5
05/08/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
05/08/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
05/09/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
05/10/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
05/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
05/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
05/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
05/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
05/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
05/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/23/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.