Tamara Monique Douglas
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00391 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
126
07/27/2018
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (CM03)
127
07/27/2018
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (CM03)
128
07/27/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
129
07/27/2018
Affidavit
130
07/27/2018
Certificate of Service
131
08/08/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
132
08/14/2018
Stipulation
133
08/15/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
134
10/17/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
135
10/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
136
10/18/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
137
11/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
138
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.