Tammy Hill
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02134 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/23/2018
Incorrect Event (Notice of) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/23/2018
Appointing Trustee
05/23/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/28/2018
Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
07/17/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement
10/08/2018
Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/08/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.