Tanaka v. Forest
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90027 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/14/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
06/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/15/2018
Summons Issued
3
07/12/2018
Summons Service Executed
6
08/17/2018
Proceeding Memo
7
08/17/2018
Setting Trial (SA)
08/17/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11
11/20/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
12
11/20/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
13
04/26/2019
Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
14
04/26/2019
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
15
04/26/2019
Stipulation
16
04/26/2019
Judgment (NOT For Dismissal - Adv Non-NID) (SA)
05/14/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.