Tanana Chiefs Conference et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00260 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/30/2018
Complaint
2
10/30/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/30/2018
Notice (Other)
11/02/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/15/2018
Amended Complaint
7
11/27/2018
Order
11/27/2018
Case Transferred Out - District (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.