Tanory v. J.c. Penney co.
Court Docket Sheet

3:1999-cv-00247 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 513 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/11/1999
DEMAND for jury trial by Joseph R. Tanory Jr.
2
03/16/1999
SUMMONS issued for J.C. Penney Co.; summons and complaint mailed by cmrrr to named defendant
03/16/1999
Notice of Assignment to U.S. Mag. Judge mailed to Attorney Jere L. Beasley (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/16/1999
File referred to Mag. Judge Carroll (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
03/19/1999
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Susan Slauson on 3/18/99 for J.C. Penney Co. Answer due on 4/7/99 for J.C. Penney Co.
4
04/13/1999
Parties' Stipulation extending the time for defendant's answer for 30 days, until 5/7/99; referred to Mag. Judge Carroll
04/14/1999
Notice of Assignment to U.S. Mag. Judge mailed to Attorney Elliot A. Salter (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/23/1999
MOTION by J.C. Penney Co. for Elliot A. Salter to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 76352 ; (w/Certificate of Good Standing attached) referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
04/26/1999
Stamped ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Elliot A. Salter to Appear Pro Hac Vice; (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll). Copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/30/1999
MOTION for L.Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiff referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
08/05/1999
Stamped ORDER granting [6-1] motion for L.Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiff (Terminated attorney Lowell Landis Sexton for Joseph R. Tanory (by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/18/1999
ORDER, set Scheduling Conference for 9:45 9/21/99 before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll ; Montgomery, AL; directing the clerk by 9/14/99 to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the attached consent form (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel.
8
09/14/1999
Plaintiff's Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Mag. Judge; referred to Mag. Judge Carroll
9
09/14/1999
Dft's Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Mag. Judge; referred to Mag. Judge Carroll
10
09/24/1999
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 9:30 7/10/00 before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll; Montgomery, AL Motion Filing deadline on 4/10/00 ; Discovery cutoff 6/26/00 ; jury trial set for 10:00 8/7/00 before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll ; set amended pleading deadline for 12/8/99 Jury selection set for 8/7/00 Mediation Notice deadline on 1/3/00 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed.
11
02/14/2000
ANSWER to Complaint by J.C. Penney Co.; (Attorney Elliot A. Salter). Referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (dkt clerk)
12
03/13/2000
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Joseph R. Tanory Jr. by M. Adam Jones
13
03/13/2000
MOTION by Joseph R. Tanory Jr. for Tiernan W. Luck, III to Withdraw as Attorney referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
03/17/2000
Stamped ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Tiernan W. Luck, III to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Tiernan W. Luck for Joseph R. Tanory (by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
05/09/2000
Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation filed by Joseph R. Tanory Jr. referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
15
07/05/2000
(Joint) MOTION by Joseph R. Tanory Jr. to continue pre-trial conference referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
16
07/06/2000
ORDER granting [15-1] motion to continue pre-trial conference, reset Pretrial Conference for 9:00 7/31/00 before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel; furn: yg hc sl.
17
07/31/2000
ORDER terminated deadlines that the pretrial conference scheduled for 7/31/00 and jury selection and trial scheduled for 8/7/00 be continued until further order of the court (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel; furn: sl hc yg cac.
18
10/13/2000
Stipulated MOTION by Joseph R. Tanory Jr., J.C. Penney Co. to Dismiss referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll
19
10/19/2000
ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Dismiss; dismissing this cause with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided.
10/19/2000
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.