Tarlicia Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81891 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
59
10/15/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
60
10/15/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
70
12/10/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
71
12/10/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
72
12/10/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
78
12/17/2018
Order (Generic-from hearing)
79
12/17/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
80
12/19/2018
Notice of Filing Claim by Debtor or Trustee
85
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
87
01/28/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.