Taylor v. Republic Services Incorporated
Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-cv-02760 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/16/2016
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13290698 filed by Charles Taylor. (submitted by Zachary Mushkatel)
1
Exhibits
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116269563" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116269563','994956','8','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
2 Attachments
2
08/16/2016
SUMMONS Submitted by Charles Taylor. (submitted by Zachary Mushkatel)
3
08/16/2016
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13290698. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-2760-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
08/17/2016
Summons Issued as to Republic Services Incorporated. (REW). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
5
08/22/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney William Clifton Alexander on behalf of Charles Taylor.
6
08/22/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lauren Elizabeth Braddy on behalf of Charles Taylor.
7
08/22/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Austin W Anderson on behalf of Charles Taylor.
08/23/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 105, receipt number PHX175468 as to Austin W Anderson, William Clifton Alexander, Lauren E Braddy. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/23/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
9
08/24/2016
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/24/2016.
10
08/26/2016
NOTICE re: Filing Certificate of Service by Charles Taylor.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
11
09/02/2016
NOTICE re: Filing Certificate of Service by Charles Taylor.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
12
09/12/2016
First MOTION for Extension of Time for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order
1 Attachment
13
09/13/2016
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Answer due 9/19/2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/13/2016.
14
09/16/2016
* MOTION to Dismiss Case and Alternative MOTION to Transfer or MOTION to Stay in Favor of a Prior Action by Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A-D
2
Exhibit E Part 1 of 2
3
Exhibit E Part 2 of 2
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116406723" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116406723','994956','45','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit F-K) *Added MOTION, MOTION to Stay on 9/19/2016
4 Attachments
15
09/16/2016
REQUEST re: for Judicial Notice by Defendant Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A, Part 1 of 2
2
Exhibit A, Part 2 of 2
3
Exhibit B-F
4
Exhibit G-J
4 Attachments
16
09/23/2016
*NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Charles Taylor.
1
Exhibit Amended Pleading
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116432311" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116432311','994956','53','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Index of Exhibits) *Modified on 9/26/2016; main document is also a strike out version; amended complaint not filed*
2 Attachments
17
09/26/2016
*(CORRECTED) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Charles Taylor. *Modified to correct event on 9/28/2016*
18
09/26/2016
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Republic Services Incorporated filed by Charles Taylor, Richard LaBryer.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116437950" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116437950','994956','57','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit) *Modified to add filer on 9/28/2016*
1 Attachment
19
09/28/2016
NOTICE re: Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Charles Taylor.
1
Exhibit Consent of Ricardo Adame
1 Attachment
20
09/29/2016
NOTICE re: Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Charles Taylor.
1
Exhibit Gary M. Taylor Consent
1 Attachment
21
09/30/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Alternative Motion to Transfer or Stay in Favor of a Prior Action MOTION to Stay filed by Charles Taylor.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
6
Exhibit
6 Attachments
22
10/03/2016
ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/3/2016.
23
10/04/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kara L Goodwin on behalf of Republic Services Incorporated.
24
10/04/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Esteban Shardonofsky on behalf of Republic Services Incorporated.
25
10/04/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Noah A Finkel on behalf of Republic Services Incorporated.
10/05/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177172 as to Kara L Goodwin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177175 as to Esteban Shardonofsky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177173 as to Noah A Finkel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
10/05/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
27
10/10/2016
REQUEST re: For Judicial Notice by Defendant Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Exhibit Ex. A Part 1
2
Exhibit Ex. A Part 2
3
Exhibit Exs. B-F
4
Exhibit Exs. G-J
5
Exhibit Exs. L, M, O
5 Attachments
28
10/10/2016
*Second MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Transfer or MOTION to Stay in Favor of a Prior Action by Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A-D
2
Exhibit E Part 1
3
Exhibit E Part 2
4
Exhibit F-K
5
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116500479" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116500479','994956','100','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Exhibit L-O) *Added MOTION to Transfer and MOTION to Stay on 10/11/2016
5 Attachments
29
10/18/2016
*MOTION to Certify Class by Charles Taylor and Richard LaBryer.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1-A through Exhibit 2-D
2
Exhibit Exhibit 3 through Exhibit 6
3
Exhibit Exhibit 7-A through Exhibit 9
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116537221" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116537221','994956','104','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) *Modified to add filer on 10/19/2016
4 Attachments
30
10/19/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Alec R Hillbo on behalf of Republic Services Incorporated.
31
10/21/2016
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Certify Class by Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
32
10/21/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 28 Second MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Transfer or MOTION to Stay in Favor of a Prior Action filed by Charles Taylor.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 3.1
5
Exhibit 4
6
Exhibit 5
7
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116555097" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116555097','994956','114','','2','1','',''}};">7</a> Exhibit 6) Modified on 10/24/2016
7 Attachments
33
10/21/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Charles Taylor.
34
10/24/2016
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification is extended to November 22, 2016. In the future, Plaintiffs' counsel should avoid the sarcastic tone of the response (hypocrisy, gamesmanship, don't be fooled, etc.). Plaintiffs' counsel can make their points as forcefully, and with more credibility, in a civil and professional tone. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10-24-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
35
10/28/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 28 Renewed Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer or Stay in Favor of a Prior Action filed by Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116580495" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116580495','994956','135','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit D) Modified on 11/1/2016
4 Attachments
36
11/07/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Richard LaBryer, Charles Taylor.
37
11/16/2016
*MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Regular Rate Claim by Republic Services Incorporated. *Modified to correct event on 11/17/2016*
38
11/16/2016
STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Regular Rate Claim by Defendant Republic Services Incorporated.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116653606" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116653606','994956','144','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit Declaration of K. Ramzinski) Modified on 11/17/2016
1 Attachment
39
11/16/2016
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's 37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Regular Rate Claim by Defendant Republic Services Incorporated.
1
Exhibit Serrano v. Republic Recommended Order
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116653619" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116653619','994956','147','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit Opinion Letter FLSA-953) Modified on 11/17/2016
2 Attachments
40
11/17/2016
ORDER finding as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss. The Court will address the motion to dismiss filed at Doc. 28. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11-17-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
41
11/17/2016
ORDER finding as moot 14 Motion to Transfer; finding as moot 14 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11-17-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
42
11/17/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Conference held on 11/17/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 5:02 PM to 5:26 PM.
43
11/21/2016
ORDER: Defendant's motion to transfer (28 is granted; the Clerk shall transfer this case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/16.
11/22/2016
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Transfer in the Southern District of Texas. New Case Number: 2:16-CV-502. (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.