Ted Roosevelt Moore, Jr. and Charnessa R Moore
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01975 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
35
06/30/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
42
07/29/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
44
08/16/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
47
08/26/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
48
08/26/2018
Schedule I
50
09/03/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.