Teddy Fortenberry, II and Brenda Nayeli Fortenberry
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00420 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/08/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
12/08/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
12/08/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
12/08/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12/08/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/08/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
7
12/09/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12/10/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
12/21/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
12/31/2018
Entry of Appearance
16
01/07/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
17
01/07/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
18
01/07/2019
Certificate of Service
01/07/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/29/2019
Non-Opposition
01/29/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/29/2019
Certificate of No Objection
21
02/01/2019
Relief from Stay
22
02/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/15/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
02/15/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/12/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
26
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
03/15/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.