Teran v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00042 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
07/20/2018
Discovery
10
09/27/2018
Order
11
10/23/2018
Continue
11/07/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/14/2018
Continue
11/16/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/28/2018
Continue
16
12/28/2018
Continue
17
12/31/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
18
03/05/2019
Continue
19
03/15/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
20
03/15/2019
Order
21
04/15/2019
Unissued Summons
04/15/2019
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
05/02/2019
Notice of Appearance
23
05/08/2019
Order
05/08/2019
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
05/09/2019
Notice of Change of Address
25
05/09/2019
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
26
05/09/2019
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
27
05/09/2019
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
28
05/13/2019
Notice (Other)
29
05/20/2019
Notice of Appearance

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.