Terrance George McCray
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00139 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/01/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
05/01/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
05/01/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
05/01/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
4
05/01/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
05/01/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
05/02/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
05/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
05/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
05/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
05/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
05/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
05/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
05/13/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
16
05/13/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
17
05/13/2019
Excepted from Electronic Filing
18
05/15/2019
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
19
05/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.