Terry Bernard Wrench
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2015-bk-04636 (alnb)

Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority (RE: related document(s)[56] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).

Form Number LR 4001 - 1 A (07 / 10) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Terry Bernard Wrench Case No. 15 - 04636 - TOM - 13 Chapter 13. yr Debtor (s) FACT SUMMARY SHEET FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY OR FOR ADEQUATE PROTECTION IN CHAPTER 7 AND 13 CASES Type of Loan / Credit Transaction: First Mortgage Date of Loan / Credit Transaction 10 / 14 / 2011 Type of Collateral: Real Estate Monthly Payment: 759. 10 Turn Amount Financed: 96, 976. 00 APR or Interest Rate: 4. 375 Term of Loan: 360 months or 30 years Payoff Amount: 90, 406. 46 as of 1 / 1 / 2018 (Date) HILJUT Value of Collateral and Basis: 96, 600. 00 (Value) as of 11 / 16 / 2015 (Date) and schedule (Basis) Address of real property: 640 Basswood Drive, Adamsville, Alabama 35005 - 2129 HHHHH Delinquent Pre - Petition Payinents: What Month (s) ? - 06 / 15 - 11 / 15 Amount ? 4926. 84 Claim filed ? v Yes Date claim filed: 03 / 11 / 2016 No Claim Number 18 - 1 Number of Months of Pre - Petition Payment Default Put into Debtor's Chapter 13 Plan: 6 Delinquent Post - Petition Payments: . What Month (s) ? 1717 - 01 / 18 Amount of mortgage payments ? 2277. 30 Late Charges ? 0. 00 Court Costs / Attorney's fees ? 781. 00 Total Amount Due 3058. 30 Claim filed ? v No Date claim filed: · Claim Number Yes 23 Number of Post - Petition Payments Received (Not How Applied); Number of Post - Petition Payments Held by Creditor but Not Applied to Debt: Number of Post - Petition Payments Returned by Creditor to Debtor: IfLease, Lease Expiration Date: If Terminated, Lease Termination Date: N / A N / A Insurer of Collateral: Term of Insurance: (Expiration Date) Prior Stay Order (s) Involving Movant, Including Current Case: Yes V No If yes, give case number (s) and date (s) of order (s) Case No .: Date: Case No .: Date: Case No .: Date: Debtor's Statement of Intention: Make ongoing mortgage payments to creditor HHHHHH Date: January 23, 2018 / s / Bowdy J. Brown Submitted by: (signature) Case 15 - 04636 - TOM13 Doc 57 Filed 01 / 23 / 18 Entered 01 / 23 / 18 11: 18: 50 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Alabama Housing Finance Authority (RE: related document(s)[56] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.

Van−014 [Notice of Final Hearing] (Rev. 07/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 15−04636−TOM13 Terry Bernard Wrench Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−3230 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING Notice is hereby given that Bowdy J. Brown, Attorney for Alabama Housing Finance Authority filed a Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay in the above−styled case. The preliminary hearing shall be consolidated with the final evidentiary hearing and parties are to be prepared for trial. The final hearing will be held to consider and act upon said Motion. Date: Thursday, February 22, 2018 Time: 10:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 3, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: January 23, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court rwh Case 15-04636-TOM13 Doc 58 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 14:12:31 Desc Notice of Final Hearing Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/16/2015
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $310 Filed by TERRY BERNARD WRENCH
3
11/16/2015
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH.
4
11/16/2015
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH.
11/16/2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(15-04636-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18718298. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/16/2015
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH.
6
11/16/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2014 Filed by Debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH.
7
11/16/2015
Appraisal Filed by Debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH.
8
11/16/2015
Debtor Request to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by Debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH.
9
11/16/2015
Motion to Determine Value of 2011 Nissan Maxima S financed by TD Auto Finance Filed by Debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH
10
11/17/2015
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11/17/2015
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor TERRY BERNARD WRENCH Case Number 05-01261, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/08/2005, Dismissed for Other Reason on 12/14/2006; Case Number 99-05724, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/30/1999, Dismissed for Other Reason on 06/30/2000; Case Number 03-01429, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/14/2003, Dismissed for Other Reason on 02/03/2004.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
11/16/2015
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/16/2015 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/19/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2 (MAM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/15/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/16/2016 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/16/2016.
12
11/17/2015
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 9 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench). Hearing scheduled 1/19/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2 (MAM) Birmingham.
13
11/17/2015
Composition Letter (plan proposes a pro rata share of $10,600.00 to unsecured creditors)
14
11/19/2015
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
15
11/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/19/2015.
16
11/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Letter). Notice Date 11/19/2015.
17
11/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench). Notice Date 11/19/2015.
18
11/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/19/2015.
19
11/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/19/2015.
20
11/20/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert John Fehse Jr Filed by Creditor TD Auto Finance LLC.
21
11/25/2015
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority.
22
12/17/2015
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/16/2015.
23
12/21/2015
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.
24
12/21/2015
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/19/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2 (MAM) Birmingham.
25
12/23/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/23/2015.
26
01/05/2016
Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien Filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench (Shinn, J.)
27
01/05/2016
Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien Filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench (Shinn, J.)
28
01/06/2016
Debtor's Objection to Claim 6 of creditor Quantum3 Group LLC as agent to Sadino Funding LLC in the amount of $2,259.07 Filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench. (Shinn, J.)
29
01/07/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench). Hearing scheduled 2/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 2 (TOM) Birmingham.
30
01/09/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/09/2016.
31
01/20/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/19/2016 11:42:26 AM ]. File Size [ 410 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:08 ]. (RE: Doc #9; Debtor's Motion to Determine Value of Collateral - 2011 Nissan Maxima S - TD Auto Finance). (adiuser).
32
01/21/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
33
01/25/2016
Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Determine Value of Collateral - 2010 Nissan Maxima - TD Auto Finance. (Related Doc # 9) Signed on 1/25/2016.
34
01/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 33 Order on Motion to Determine Value). Notice Date 01/27/2016.
35
02/02/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 2/2/2016 (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench, 23 Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied.
36
02/04/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 02/04/2016.
37
02/05/2016
Order Granting Motion To Avoid Judicial Lien and that, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 522(f), the Judicial Lien of Sterling Jewelers, Inc. dba Kay Jewelers recorded in Book Number LR201514, Page 3953, Jefferson County, Alabama shall be and hereby is AVOIDED to the extent it impairs the Debtors exemptions. (Related Doc # 26) Signed on 2/5/2016.
38
02/05/2016
Order Granting Motion To Avoid Judicial Lien and that, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 522(f), the Judicial Lien of Doug Reid Auto Sales, Inc. recorded in Instrument #: 9763-0437, Jefferson County, Bessemer Division, Alabama shall be and hereby is AVOIDED to the extent it impairs the Debtors exemptions. (Related Doc # 27) Signed on 2/5/2016.
39
02/07/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order on Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien). Notice Date 02/07/2016.
40
02/07/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order on Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien). Notice Date 02/07/2016.
41
02/08/2016
Debtor's Objection to Claim 4 of creditor City Auto Sales in the amount of $4,096.31 Filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench. (Shinn, J.)
42
02/09/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 41 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench). Hearing scheduled 3/15/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 2 (TOM) Birmingham.
43
02/10/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/9/2016 9:40:32 AM ]. File Size [ 291 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:48 ]. (RE: Doc #28; Debtor's Objection to Claim #6 of Quantum3 Group LLC as agent to Sadino Funding LLC in the amount of $2,259.07). (adiuser).
44
02/10/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order on Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien). Notice Date 02/10/2016.
45
02/10/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order on Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien). Notice Date 02/10/2016.
46
02/11/2016
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 6 Signed on 2/11/2016 (RE: related document(s) 28 Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench). Claim #6 shall be treated as a general unsecured claim.(rwh)
47
02/11/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/11/2016.
48
02/13/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 02/13/2016.
49
02/18/2016
Debtor's Objection to Duplicate Claim 12 of creditor LVNV Funding, LLC in the amount of $934.09 Filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench.
50
03/02/2016
Withdrawal of Claims: 12 Filed by Creditor LVNV Funding LLC.
51
03/02/2016
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 49 Debtor's Objection to Duplicate Claim 12 of creditor LVNV Funding, LLC in the amount of $934.09 Filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench.).
52
03/08/2016
Withdrawal of Claims: 1 Filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench.
53
03/16/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/15/2016 10:10:31 AM ]. File Size [ 226 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:38 ]. (RE: Doc #41; Debtor's Objection to Claim #4 of City Auto Sales in the amount of $4,096.31). (adiuser).
54
03/18/2016
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 4 Signed on 3/18/2016 (RE: related document(s) 41 Sustaining Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Terry Bernard Wrench). Claim #4 is Disallowed.
55
03/20/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 54 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 03/20/2016.
56
01/23/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority
1
Exhibit A - Mortgage #
2
Exhibit B - Affidavit
2 Attachments
01/23/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(15-04636-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21634384. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 56) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
01/23/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority (RE: related document(s)[56] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
58
01/23/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Alabama Housing Finance Authority (RE: related document(s)[56] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.