Terry Lee Sanders
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00043 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/25/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/25/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
22
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
23
10/23/2018
Employ (CM41)
24
10/23/2018
Declaration
25
10/24/2018
Employ
26
11/08/2018
Employ (CM41)
27
11/08/2018
Declaration
28
11/08/2018
Sell Property (Sec 363(b) - NOT Free & Clear) (CM22)
29
11/08/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
30
11/08/2018
Certificate of Service
11/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
12/03/2018
Certificate of No Objection
32
12/07/2018
Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.