Tester Drilling Services, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00244 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/15/2018
Complaint
2
10/15/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/16/2018
Unissued Summons
10/16/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/23/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
5
10/23/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
10/24/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/14/2018
Answer to Complaint
8
12/04/2018
Answer to Complaint
9
12/04/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
10
12/04/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
11
12/05/2018
Answer to Counterclaim
12
12/10/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
13
12/19/2018
Stay
14
12/26/2018
Order on Motion to Stay
01/02/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/08/2019
Status Report
20
02/28/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
21
03/28/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
22
04/05/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
04/08/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
04/10/2019
Amend/Correct
04/11/2019
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
04/11/2019
Answer to Complaint
27
04/24/2019
Answer to Counterclaim
28
05/20/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.