The Auction Block Co.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00308 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
54
06/21/2018
Report of Sale
55
06/29/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
06/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
06/29/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
07/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
07/24/2018
Certificate of No Objection
58
07/27/2018
Relief from Stay
59
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
60
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
61
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
62
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
63
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
64
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
65
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
66
07/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
08/23/2018
Stipulation on Proof of Claim
68
09/11/2018
Stipulation on Proof of Claim
69
09/13/2018
Stipulation on Proof of Claim
70
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
71
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
72
09/18/2018
Claims (SA)
73
09/18/2018
Claims (SA)
74
09/18/2018
Claims (SA)
75
09/18/2018
Claims (SA)
76
09/18/2018
Claims (SA)
09/18/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
78
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
79
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
80
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
81
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
82
09/26/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
83
09/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
84
09/26/2018
Certificate of Service
85
09/26/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
86
09/28/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
87
10/15/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
88
10/16/2018
Report of Sale
89
10/16/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
10/17/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
10/17/2018
Certificate of No Objection
91
10/17/2018
Certificate of Service
92
11/15/2018
Certificate of No Objection
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.