The Cincinnati Insurance Company et al v. Samsung SDI Company LTD et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

5:2017-cv-01688 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 162 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/02/2017
COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Asus Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc, Henry Schein Inc, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Company LTD, and Simplo Technology Company LTD filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc, and The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(AHI)
2
10/02/2017
NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Proctor until further notice. Please use case number 5:17-CV-1688-UJH-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (AHI) Modified on 10/2/2017
10/03/2017
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2943766 (B4601083532). related document 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Asus Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc, Henry Schein Inc, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Company LTD, and Simplo Technology Company LTD filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc, and The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(AHI). Modified on 10/4/2017 (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/03/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company
4
10/03/2017
MOTION Appoint Special Process Server by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Special Process Server
2
Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Special Process Server
3
Supplement Letters Rogatory
4
Supplement Letters Rogatory
4 Attachments
5
10/03/2017
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Auto-Owners Insurance Company
6
10/03/2017
MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2
Exhibit Letters Rogatory
3
Exhibit Letters Rogatory
3 Attachments
7
10/03/2017
Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Asus Computer International, Henry Schein Inc, Samsung SDI America Inc, and Samsung SDI Company LTD.
8
10/04/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc. filed by Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc
9
10/05/2017
Request for service by certified mail filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.
10
10/06/2017
Summons Reissued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Asus Computer International, Henry Schein Inc, and Samsung SDI America Inc.
11
10/10/2017
ORDER denying 4 Motion to appoint private process server ; denying 6 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory without prejudice; on or before October 24, 2017, Plaintiffs MAY file an amended motion clarifying to the court how they intend to submit the letter rogatory to the appropriate Taiwanese judicial authority. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/10/2017.
12
10/13/2017
AMENDED Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Modified on 10/13/2017 (AHI
1 Attachment
13
10/23/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed Henry Schein Inc served on 10/10/2017, answer due 10/31/2017, no signature on green card (AHI)
14
10/30/2017
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Asus Computer International.
15
10/30/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asus Computer International. filed by Asus Computer International
16
10/30/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Henry Schein Inc.
17
10/31/2017
TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Defendant Henry Schein, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time 16, which is unopposed. For good cause shown, Defendant's Motion 16 is GRANTED. Defendant Henry Schein, Inc. SHALL file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before November 14, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/31/2017.
18
10/27/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed Asus Computer International served on 10/16/2017, answer due 11/6/2017; Samsung SDI America Inc served on 10/16/2017, answer due 11/6/2017. (AHI) Modified on 10/31/2017
19
11/01/2017
INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/1/2017. (AHI)
20
11/02/2017
ORDER that the AMENDED 12 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Service of Foreign Defendants is GRANTED; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/2/2017. (AHI)
21
11/02/2017
Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Asustek Computer Inc, and Simplo Technology Company LTD. (AHI)
22
11/08/2017
REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE - LETTER ROGATORY (ASUSTEK Computer, Inc., and Simplo Technology Co., LTD.) Letter of Rogatory issued by the Clerk of Court - delivered to plaintiff pursuant to 20 Order issued on 11/2/2017 (AHI) Modified on 11/8/2017
23
11/09/2017
Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Party Planning Meeting by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.
24
11/09/2017
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Samsung SDI America Inc.
25
11/09/2017
TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Party Planning Meeting. 23 For good cause shown, the parties' Motion 23 is GRANTED. The parties' obligation to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference is hereby STAYED for a period of 60 days to allow for service of the foreign Defendants. On or before January 9, 2017, Plaintiffs SHALL submit a report on the status of service of the foreign Defendants.Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/9/2017.
26
11/14/2017
MOTION to Dismiss by Henry Schein Inc.
27
12/05/2017
Second MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.
28
12/05/2017
ORDER that the 27 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory is GRANTED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/5/2017.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B) (AHI
2 Attachments
29
12/06/2017
TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Defendant Henry Schein, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss 26, which was filed after the court granted a stay of discovery. Since the movant is a domestic defendant, and the motion to dismiss concerns the sufficiency of the pleadings, Plaintiffs SHALL respond to Henry Schein's motion to dismiss on or before December 22, 2017. Defendant Henry Schein MAY file a reply brief on or before January 10, 2018. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/6/2017.
30
12/22/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in Alternative Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc.
31
12/27/2017
Third MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.
32
12/27/2017
ORDER that Plaintiffs' 31 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Service of Foreign Defendants is GRANTED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/27/17.
1
Letter 1
2
Letter 2) (SPT
2 Attachments
33
12/27/2017
NOTICE by Clerk of filing Issuance of Subpoena pursuant to Order (doc. 32) entered 12/27/17.
1
Letter 2)(SPT
1 Attachment
34
01/09/2018
STATUS REPORT of Service of the Foreign Defendants by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc, The Cincinnati Insurance Company
35
01/09/2018
TEXT ORDER-This case is before the court on Plaintiffs' Report on the Status of Service of the Foreign Defendants 34, which requests a sixty (60) day extension of the stay on the Rule 26(f) conference. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' request for an extension of the stay is GRANTED. The parties' obligation to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference is hereby STAYED for an additional 60 days. On or before March 12, 2018, Plaintiffs SHALL submit a report on the status of service of the foreign Defendants. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/9/2018.
36
01/10/2018
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Henry Schein Inc re: 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Henry Schein Inc.
37
01/25/2018
ANSWER to Complaint by Samsung SDI Company LTD.
38
03/12/2018
STATUS REPORT of Service of the Foreign Defendants by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Terry A Burgess DDS, Inc, The Cincinnati Insurance Company
39
03/13/2018
TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Plaintiffs' Report on the Status of Service of the Foreign Defendants 38, which requests a sixty (60) day extension of the stay on the Rule 26(f) conference. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' request for an extension of the stay is GRANTED. The parties' obligation to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference is hereby STAYED for an additional 60 days. On or before May 11, 2018, Plaintiffs SHALL submit a report on the status of service of the foreign Defendants. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/13/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.