The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company v. George
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

3:2009-cv-00986 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/27/2009
COMPLAINT against Steven E. George (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602011592.), filed by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Civil Filing Fee Receipt
3 Attachments
10/27/2009
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
10/27/2009
Summons and Complaint Issued as to Steven E. George mailed by CMRRR.
3
10/30/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Steven George for Steven E. George served on 10/29/2009, answer due 11/18/2009.
4
11/16/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Stark Haynes on behalf of Steven E. George
11/17/2009
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Steven E. George (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/17/2009
Case Reassigned to Honorable William Keith Watkins and Honorable Terry F. Moorer. Honorable Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
6
11/17/2009
NOTICE by Steven E. George Notice of Settlement
7
11/19/2009
ORDERED that the parties file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before December 11, 2009. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 11/19/2009.
8
12/11/2009
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint stipulation for Dismissal by Steven E. George.
9
12/18/2009
ORDER re 8 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal that this action has been dismissed by operation of Rule 41, on the terms agreed to and set out by the parties. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to close this case. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/18/2009.
1
Civil Appeal Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.