The Downtown Soup Kitchen v. Municipality of Anchorage et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00190 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/16/2018
Complaint
2
08/16/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
08/16/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/16/2018
Unissued Summons
4
08/17/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
5
08/17/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
6
08/17/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
08/20/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
08/21/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
08/24/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/27/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
13
08/29/2018
Affidavit of Service
14
08/29/2018
Affidavit of Service
15
08/29/2018
Affidavit of Service
16
08/29/2018
Affidavit of Service
17
09/04/2018
Notice of Appearance
18
09/04/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
19
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
20
09/24/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
21
09/25/2018
Notice (Other)
09/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
10/03/2018
Notice of Appearance
24
10/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
25
10/15/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
26
10/17/2018
Answer to Complaint
27
10/19/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
28
11/01/2018
Leave to File Document
29
11/01/2018
Preliminary Injunction
30
11/01/2018
Memorandum
31
11/01/2018
Declaration
32
11/01/2018
Declaration
33
11/01/2018
Declaration
34
11/01/2018
Declaration
35
11/01/2018
Declaration
36
11/01/2018
Declaration
37
11/09/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
38
11/14/2018
Scheduling Order
11/16/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
11/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
40
11/14/2018
Notice (Other)
42
11/21/2018
Notice of Appearance
43
11/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
44
11/21/2018
Stay
45
11/21/2018
Expedite
46
11/21/2018
Errata
47
11/26/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
48
11/27/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
49
11/27/2018
Affidavit
11/28/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
11/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
53
11/29/2018
Affidavit
54
11/29/2018
Notice (Other)
55
12/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
56
12/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
57
12/06/2018
Notice (Other)
58
12/07/2018
Witness List
59
12/10/2018
Notice (Other)
60
12/12/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
61
12/12/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
62
12/13/2018
Hearing
63
12/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
64
12/13/2018
Declaration
65
12/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
12/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
12/18/2018
Stipulation
68
12/18/2018
Hearing
69
12/20/2018
Order on Stipulation
12/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
01/14/2019
Errata
73
01/14/2019
Errata
74
03/27/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
75
04/03/2019
Transcript
76
05/13/2019
Notice (Other)
77
05/14/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
78
05/20/2019
Notice (Other)
79
05/24/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
80
05/24/2019
Seal Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.