The Mane Choice Hair Solutions, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

5:2015-cv-01671 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 575 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/23/2015
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Amazon.com, Inc. filed by The Mane Choice Hair Solutions, LLC.
1
Exhibits A-C
2
https://ecf.alnd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01913973619" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01913973619','156542','5','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibits D-H)(SPT)
2 Attachments
09/28/2015
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601002482 (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/25/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Amazon.com, Inc.
3
11/25/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc. filed by Amazon.com, Inc.
4
11/30/2015
ORDER that a telephone conference is set for December 21, 2015 at 10:15 AM Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 11/30/15. (SPT)
5
11/30/2015
ORDER that the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than January 11, 2016, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 11/30/15. (SPT)
6
12/02/2015
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory L. Doll by Amazon.com, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
7
12/02/2015
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald M. St. Marie by Amazon.com, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1)(St. Marie, Ronald
1 Attachment
8
12/02/2015
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Louise K. Machado by Amazon.com, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
12/14/2015
TEXT ORDER that the telephone status conference is RESET for 12/18/2015 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 12/14/15. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2015
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2533204 (B4601067586). Modified on 12/21/2015 (SPT). (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2015
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2533213 (B4601067587). (St. Marie, Ronald) Modified on 12/21/2015 (SPT). (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2015
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2533232 (B4601067588). Modified on 12/21/2015 (SPT). (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/18/2015
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Doll; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ronald M. St. Marie; granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Louise K. Machado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 12/18/15.
10
01/12/2016
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT; the parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III no longer assigned to the case. (SPT)
11
01/13/2016
INITIAL ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/14/2016. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/13/2016.
12
03/14/2016
NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF MATTER
13
03/14/2016
TEXT ORDER: The parties have notified the Court that they have settled this action. (Doc. 12). On or before April 15, 2016, the parties shall please file a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint report updating the Court on the status of the settlement. The Court will reset the Rule 26(f) report deadline, if necessary, by separate order. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/14/2016.
14
04/13/2016
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Amazon.com, Inc. with Prejudice by Amazon.com, Inc. filed by Amazon.com, Inc.
15
04/14/2016
ORDER - The Court ORDERS that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The parties are to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/14/2016.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.