Thelma Elizabeth Peeples
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02078 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
12/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
02/07/2019
Relief from Stay
02/07/2019
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
37
02/27/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)
38
03/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.