Theodore Jack Jamison
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00268 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
55
06/05/2018
Certificate of No Objection
56
06/06/2018
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
09/28/2018
Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)
10/01/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.