Theresa Marie Hofacre
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00085 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
06/19/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
15
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
07/06/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
17
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/09/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.