Therrien v. Juneau Sportfishing, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00051 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
24
06/06/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
25
06/11/2018
Scheduling Order
26
07/09/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
07/10/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
02/01/2019
Witness List
29
02/01/2019
Witness List
30
02/26/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
02/27/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/03/2019
Continue
35
04/04/2019
Order
04/19/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
04/24/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.