Thiele v. Baird et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00045 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
06/04/2018
Amended Complaint
31
06/04/2018
Unissued Summons
06/15/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/18/2018
Notice of Appearance
33
06/18/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
34
06/19/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
35
06/19/2018
Scheduling Order
36
07/09/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
37
07/09/2018
Appoint Counsel
38
07/09/2018
Reconsideration
39
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
40
07/26/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
41
07/26/2018
Appoint Counsel
42
08/10/2018
Extension of Time to Amend
43
08/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
44
08/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
45
08/15/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.