Thomas Anthony Milavec and Jennifer Lynn Milavec
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00134 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/05/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Thomas Anthony Milavec and Jennifer Lynn Milavec
49
11/26/2018
Change of Address
11/27/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
04/10/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
04/10/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
04/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.