Thomas Lee Crandall, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00151 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
05/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/23/2018
Hearing
388
06/07/2018
Proceeding Memo
389
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
390
06/18/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
391
06/20/2018
Relief from Stay
392
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
393
07/11/2018
Certificate of No Objection
394
07/17/2018
Approve Settlement
395
07/24/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
07/25/2018
Claim Utility (spreads to claims register - image or no image - can set claim status) (Text entry; no document attached.)
396
07/26/2018
Employ (CM41)
397
07/27/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
398
07/27/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
399
07/27/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
400
07/27/2018
Hearing
401
07/27/2018
Hearing
402
07/27/2018
Hearing
403
07/27/2018
Hearing
404
07/30/2018
Certification
07/30/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
405
07/30/2018
Employ
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
406
08/24/2018
Stipulation on Proof of Claim
407
08/24/2018
Stipulation on Proof of Claim
408
08/28/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
409
08/28/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
410
08/28/2018
Certificate of Service
08/30/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
411
08/30/2018
Claims (SA)
412
08/31/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
413
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
414
08/31/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
415
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
416
09/18/2018
Certificate of No Objection
09/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
417
09/19/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
418
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
419
10/04/2018
Proceeding Memo
420
10/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
421
10/09/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
422
10/09/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
423
10/09/2018
Certificate of Service
424
10/16/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
425
10/18/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
426
10/19/2018
Claims (SA)
427
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
428
10/31/2018
Certificate of No Objection
429
11/02/2018
Compensation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.