Thomas Michael Rowan and Christina Marie Rowan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-04532 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 124 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/20/2017
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Thomas Michael Rowan, Christina Marie Rowan
3
10/20/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Joint Debtor Christina Marie Rowan, Debtor Thomas Michael Rowan.
4
10/20/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Christina Marie Rowan, Debtor Thomas Michael Rowan.
10/20/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(17-04532-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21307144. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/20/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 01/26/2018.
6
10/21/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
7
10/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 10/22/2017.
8
10/23/2017
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 10/23/2017.
9
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
10
11/13/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Regions Bank
11
11/13/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Regions Bank (RE: related document(s) 10 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
11/13/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04532-TOM7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21391627. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 10) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/13/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Regions Bank (RE: related document(s) 10 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Regions Bank). Hearing scheduled 12/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
11/13/2017
Corrective Entry - regenerated notice to correct spelling of attorney name. (RE: related document(s) 12 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 11/15/2017.
15
11/27/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
16
11/27/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Joint Debtor
17
11/27/2017
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Andre' M Toffel, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 274160.00, Assets Exempt: $ 35826.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 351693.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 351693.00. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor absent. (Toffel, Andre')
18
11/28/2017
Order Granting without objection the Motion For Relief From Stay. (Related Doc # 10) Signed on 11/28/2017.
19
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
20
01/18/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and Ditech Financial LLC Filed by Creditor DITECH FINANCIAL LLC.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
21
01/23/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and Ally Bank Filed by Creditor Ally Bank.
22
01/23/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and Ally Bank Filed by Creditor Ally Bank.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.