Thomas Mike Meyer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00187 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/18/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/18/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
06/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/18/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
5
06/18/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
06/18/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
06/18/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/19/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
11
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
06/25/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
07/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/06/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
16
08/10/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing
17
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
08/15/2018
Entry of Appearance
19
09/04/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
20
09/05/2018
Certificate of Service
24
09/12/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
25
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
09/17/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
28
09/18/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
29
09/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
30
12/31/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
01/02/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
01/07/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
01/14/2019
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
34
01/14/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
36
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/17/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.