Thomas Mitchell Irwin, Jr. and Tracy Annette Irwin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00385 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/01/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
11/01/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
11/01/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/01/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/01/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
11/02/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/01/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
11/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
11/02/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
11/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
11/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
11/08/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
14
11/08/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
15
11/08/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
16
11/08/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
17
11/08/2018
Affidavit of Service
11/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/30/2018
Request for Special Notice
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/02/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
20
01/07/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/08/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
22
01/09/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
23
01/09/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
24
01/09/2019
Proceeding Memo
25
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
01/11/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.