Thomas Robert Simpson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00093 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
05/30/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
05/31/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Entry of Appearance
06/01/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/04/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
doc
06/04/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
doc
06/04/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
06/06/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
06/06/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
45
06/08/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
46
06/08/2018
Proceeding Memo
47
06/08/2018
Extend Automatic Stay
48
06/08/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
49
06/08/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
50
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
06/22/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
53
06/22/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
54
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
06/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
06/26/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
56
06/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
06/28/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
06/28/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
58
06/28/2018
Request for Special Notice
06/29/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/03/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
07/05/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
61
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
07/12/2018
Extend Time
63
07/12/2018
Certificate of Service
64
07/16/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
65
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
07/25/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
67
07/25/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
68
07/25/2018
Schedule J (Form 106J)
69
07/25/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
07/25/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
08/01/2018
Certificate of Service
71
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
72
08/03/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
74
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
75
08/28/2018
Hearing
76
09/11/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
77
09/12/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
78
09/12/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
79
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
80
09/17/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
81
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
82
09/18/2018
Relief from Stay
83
09/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
84
09/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
86
10/23/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
87
10/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
88
10/26/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
89
10/26/2018
Certificate of Service
90
10/30/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
10/30/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
92
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
93
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
94
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
95
11/15/2018
Declaration About Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec and 202)
96
11/15/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
97
11/15/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
98
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
99
12/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
100
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
101
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.